Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Antonio Perales Mercado

Deceased

Bishop of Barbastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1706³BornLa Almunia de Doña Godina
26 Sep 176660.3AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
16 Nov 176660.5Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
22 Nov 177266.5DiedBishop of Barbastro, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Felipe Antonio Perales Mercado:
Bishop Felipe Antonio Perales Mercado (born , died ) Bishop of Barbastro

  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 84, Number 423
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 8 Dec 2015