Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Antonio de Murillo y Argáiz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1705Born
17 Jul 175246.8AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
17 Sep 175247.0Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
1 Jun 176559.7ResignedBishop of Segovia, Spain
4 Mar 177266.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Antonio de Murillo y Argáiz
Bishop Manuel Antonio de Murillo y Argáiz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMurillo de Río Leza

  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 70, Number 338
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1752, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 373
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast