Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edmund Rich

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Oct 1233AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
2 Apr 1234Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
16 Nov 1240DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Edmund Rich:
Archbishop Edmund Rich (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 57
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 8 Jan 2014