Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard of Wendene (Wendover)

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Mar 1235SelectedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
20 Mar 1238ConfirmedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
21 Nov 1238Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
12 Oct 1250DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard of Wendene (Wendover):
Bishop Richard of Wendene (Wendover) (died ) Bishop of Rochester

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 58
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 560

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013