Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joceline of Wells

Deceased

Bishop of Bath and Wells, England


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Feb 1206SelectedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
28 May 1206Ordained BishopBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain
19 Nov 1242DiedBishop of Bath and Wells, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Joceline of Wells:
Bishop Joceline of Wells (died ) Bishop of Bath and Wells

  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 54
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013