Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hubert Walter

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Sep 1189AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
22 Oct 1189Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
30 May 1193AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
13 Jul 1205DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Hubert Walter:
Archbishop Hubert Walter (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 51
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 10
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 595

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013