Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William of Saint Mary’s Church

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of London, England


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Sep 1198SelectedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
23 May 1199Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
26 Jan 1221ResignedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
27 Mar 1224DiedBishop Emeritus of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William of Saint Mary’s Church
Bishop William of Saint Mary’s Church (died ) Bishop Emeritus of London

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 53
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Mar 2016