Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William de Raley

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Apr 1239SelectedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
25 Sep 1239Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
1 Sep 1242SelectedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
13 Sep 1243ConfirmedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
1 Sep 1250DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William de Raley
Bishop William de Raley (died ) Bishop of Winchester

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 58
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 9
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 461

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018