Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ralph Neville

Deceased

Bishop of Chichester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Nov 1222AppointedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
21 Apr 1224Ordained BishopBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain
1 Feb 1244DiedBishop of Chichester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Ralph Neville:
Bishop Ralph Neville (died ) Bishop of Chichester

  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 56
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013