Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Briwere

Deceased

Bishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Nov 1223AppointedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
21 Apr 1224Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
24 Oct 1244DiedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Briwere
Bishop William Briwere (died ) Bishop of Exeter

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, Chapel, Westminster

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 56
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 369
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,813

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast