Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ralph of Maidstone, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hereford, England


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Sep 1234AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
12 Nov 1234Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
17 Dec 1239ResignedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
1244¹DiedBishop Emeritus of Hereford, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ralph of Maidstone
Bishop Ralph of Maidstone O.F.M. (died 1244) Bishop Emeritus of Hereford

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 57
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 458

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 17 Feb 2016