Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Bingham

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Sep 1228AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
27 May 1229Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
3 Nov 1246DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Bingham
Bishop Robert Bingham (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 57
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 595

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast