Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Peter von Richarz

Deceased

Bishop of Augsburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1783Born
20 Dec 180623.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
11 Apr 180723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
8 Apr 183551.8SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
24 Jul 183552.1ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
1 Nov 183552.4Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
9 Oct 183653.3SelectedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
21 Nov 183653.4ConfirmedBishop of Augsburg, Germany
22 Feb 183753.7InstalledBishop of Augsburg, Germany
2 Jul 185572.1DiedBishop of Augsburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Peter von Richarz (VIAF: 77069288)
Bishop Johann Peter von Richarz (born , died ) Bishop of Augsburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWürzburg

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 95, and Page 351
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast