Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Hayek, B.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade} (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1928BornMaghdouché
1 Aug 195425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
19 Jul 198960.9AppointedArchbishop of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
11 Feb 199061.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
200677.3RetiredArchbishop of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
1 May 201081.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade} (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Antoine Hayek:
Archbishop Antoine Hayek B.C. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bāniyās {Cesarea di Filippo; Paneade}

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,959
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013