Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Ruiz de Azúa Ortiz de Zárate, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Hai Phòng, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Cardicium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1868Born
31 Aug 188416.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Jun 191749.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
19 Jun 191749.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cardicium
9 Dec 191749.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cardicium
14 Apr 191951.0SucceededVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
22 May 192961.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Hai Phòng, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ruiz de Azúa Ortiz de Zárate
Bishop Francisco Ruiz de Azúa Ortiz de Zárate O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Hai Phòng

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUllibari Gamboa, Spain

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast