Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Ramón Lahoz de San Blas, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1771Born
20 Dec 183261.4SelectedBishop of Huesca, Spain
15 Apr 183361.7ConfirmedBishop of Huesca, Spain
8 Sep 183362.1Ordained BishopBishop of Huesca, Spain
15 Sep 184574.1DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Ramón Lahoz de San Blas
Bishop Lorenzo Ramón Lahoz de San Blas Sch. P. (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMezquita de Jarque

  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,547
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 293
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 149, Number 815
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast