Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito (Francesco Xavier Michael) de Uría y Valdés, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1730BornCangas de Tineo
26 Sep 178555.5AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
26 Feb 178656.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
23 Jun 181080.3DiedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Benito (Francesco Xavier Michael) de Uría y Valdés:
Bishop Benito (Francesco Xavier Michael) de Uría y Valdés O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Ciudad Rodrigo

  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 104, Number 540
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 166

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016