Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Veremundo Anselmo Arias y Teixeiro, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Valencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1742BornBanga, Spain
26 Mar 180461.4AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
10 Jun 180461.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
19 Dec 181472.1AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
25 Mar 181572.4InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
24 Feb 182481.3DiedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Veremundo Anselmo Arias y Teixeiro:
Archbishop Veremundo Anselmo Arias y Teixeiro O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Valencia

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1804, Number 17
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 297, and Page 387
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 125, Number 664

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015