Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Grgur Rajčević

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1826Born
12 Jun 184822.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
30 Sep 184822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
17 Nov 189165.7AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
27 Dec 189165.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
25 Oct 189973.7DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Grgur Rajčević (VIAF: 3590145857132622921902)
Archbishop Grgur Rajčević (born , died ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDubrovnik, Diocese of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)
Ordained BishopGorizia, Archdiocese of Gorizia e Gradisca, Italy

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,891, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast