Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Trifon Radoničić

Deceased

Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1839Born
8 Jun 186828.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 188848.6AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
25 Nov 188849.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
18 Mar 189555.4DiedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Trifon Radoničić
Bishop Trifon Radoničić (born , died ) Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrčanj
Ordained BishopKotor, Diocese of Kotor (Cattaro)

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1888, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017