Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paškal Buconjić, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1834BornDrinovci
13 Oct 185218.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
25 Mar 185824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
30 Jan 188045.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Herzegovina
30 Jan 188045.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Magydus
19 Mar 188046.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magydus
9 Oct 188147.5SelectedBishop of Mostar-Duvno, Bosnia and Herzegovina
18 Nov 188147.6ConfirmedBishop of Mostar-Duvno, Bosnia and Herzegovina
10 Nov 191076.6DiedBishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan), Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Paškal Buconjić:
Bishop Paškal Buconjić O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Mostar-Duvno (-Trebinje e Mrkan)

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 359, and Page 363

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013