Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Ignacio Riaño, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}

Titular Bishop of Thaumacus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1829BornSantander, Spain
16 Sep 184819.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
19 Feb 185323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Aug 186637.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
31 Aug 186637.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
1 Jan 186838.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
Nov 1879³50.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam
26 Nov 188455.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Ignacio Riaño:
Bishop Manuel Ignacio Riaño O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Central Tonking {Tonkino Centrale}

  • a priest for 31.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 544
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 39, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013