Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leon Michał von Przyłuski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1789³BornStrzeszynek
4 Jun 181424.6Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
21 Oct 184455.0SelectedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
20 Jan 184555.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
27 Apr 184555.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
12 Mar 186575.4DiedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leon Michał von Przyłuski (VIAF: 57399242)
Archbishop Leon Michał von Przyłuski (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 204
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016