Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Kanty Dąbrowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

Titular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1791BornUmieczki
31 Jul 181422.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Poznań, Poland
24 Sep 181423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
16 Jul 182129.8IncardinatedPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
19 Jun 184351.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
19 Jun 184351.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
20 Aug 184351.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Helenopolis in Bithynia
4 Apr 185361.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Kanty Dąbrowski:
Bishop Jan Kanty Dąbrowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 38.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013