Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Félix Blanc, S.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tonga Islands {Isole Tonga}

Titular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1872BornToulon, France
23 Jun 189523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
17 Feb 191239.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Oceania, Tonga
17 Feb 191239.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
29 Jun 191240.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dibon (Dibona)
1953²80.7RetiredVicar Apostolic of Tonga Islands {Isole Tonga}, Pacific (Oceania)
8 Jun 196290.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tonga Islands {Isole Tonga}, Pacific (Oceania)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Félix Blanc:
Bishop Joseph Félix Blanc S.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tonga Islands {Isole Tonga}

  • a priest for 66.9 years
  • a bishop for 49.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: LC
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015