Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Hyacinthe de Ploeuc de Timeur

Deceased

Bishop of Quimper


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1661BornLandudec, Finistère
24 Dec 170645.6SelectedBishop of Quimper, France
11 Apr 170745.9ConfirmedBishop of Quimper, France
19 Jun 170746.1Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper, France
18 Jan 173977.7DiedBishop of Quimper, France

MicroData Summary for François-Hyacinthe de Ploeuc de Timeur:
Bishop François-Hyacinthe de Ploeuc de Timeur (born , died ) Bishop of Quimper

  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015