Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Rogier du Crévy

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Jul 1712AppointedBishop of Le Mans, France
21 Aug 1712Ordained BishopBishop of Le Mans, France
2 Aug 1723DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Rogier du Crévy:
Bishop Pierre Rogier du Crévy (died ) Bishop of Le Mans

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 154
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1712, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015