Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Pistilli Scorzara, P. Schönstatt

Bishop of Encarnación


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 May 1965 BornAsunción
9 Nov 199631.4Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Institute of Schönstatt Fathers
10 May 199731.9Ordained PriestPriest of Institute of Schönstatt Fathers
15 Nov 201449.4AppointedBishop of Encarnación, Paraguay
20 Dec 201449.5Ordained BishopBishop of Encarnación, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Pistilli Scorzara:
Bishop Francisco Javier Pistilli Scorzara P. Schönstatt (born ) Bishop of Encarnación

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Encarnación.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2014
  • c1/ob: CB, 15 Nov 2014
  • c2: CB, 19 Dec 2014
  • c3: CB, 20 Dec 2014
  • c4: CB, 21 Dec 2014
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015