Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Miguel Pineda y Saldaña

Deceased

Bishop of San Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1791BornZacatecoluca, Guatemala
18 Sep 181826.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Sep 181927.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 184856.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
3 Jul 184856.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Antigonea
25 Feb 184957.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antigonea
10 Mar 185361.2AppointedBishop of San Salvador, El Salvador
6 Aug 187583.6DiedBishop of San Salvador, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for Tomás Miguel Pineda y Saldaña:
Bishop Tomás Miguel Pineda y Saldaña (born , died ) Bishop of San Salvador

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 106, and Page 495

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013