Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ermenold Piesport, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Fulda

Titular Bishop of Capharnaum

Titular See: (Johann Philipp Jakob)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1724³BornPeterslahr
1 Nov 174520.8ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Mar 174924.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Mar 175025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Jan 177651.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany
29 Jan 177651.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
17 Mar 177651.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capharnaum
8 Feb 177853.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ermenold Piesport:
Bishop Ermenold Piesport O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Fulda

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 145, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Dec 2015