Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselm Franz von Ingelheim

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1683Born
23 Apr 172642.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
31 Dec 172845.1Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
29 Aug 174662.7SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
28 Nov 174663.0ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
27 Aug 174763.7Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
9 Feb 174965.2DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anselm Franz von Ingelheim
Bishop Anselm Franz von Ingelheim (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainz

  • a priest for 20.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast