Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Philipp von Greifenclau zu Vollraths

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1652Born
22 Dec 168533.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
13 Apr 168735.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
9 Feb 169946.9SelectedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
1 Jun 169947.3ConfirmedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
5 Jul 169947.3Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
3 Aug 171967.4DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Philipp von Greifenclau zu Vollraths
Bishop Johann Philipp von Greifenclau zu Vollraths (born , died ) Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmorbach

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 16
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,606
  • b/c2+: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018