Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Loredano Balbi

Deceased

Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1745Born
17 Dec 176823.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 179549.5AppointedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
25 Jul 179549.7Ordained BishopBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
23 May 183185.5DiedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Loredano Balbi
Bishop Teodoro Loredano Balbi (born , died ) Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVeglia, Diocese of Krk (Veglia)
Ordained BishopSan Pietro di Castello, Basilica, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Death PlaceNovigrad, Diocese of Novigrad (Cittanova)
Buried Place (Original)St. Agata, Church, Novigrad, Diocese of Novigrad (Cittanova)
Buried Place (Current)St. Pelagius, Church, Novigrad, Diocese of Novigrad (Cittanova)

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 68
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1795, Number 40
  • ob/c2+/loc: AT, 18 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast