Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Pei Xiangde (Pei Shangde)

Deceased

Bishop of Beijing [Peking], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1918¹Born
30 May 194830.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jun 198971.4Ordained BishopBishop of Beijing [Peking], China
24 Dec 200183.9DiedBishop of Beijing [Peking], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthias Pei Xiangde (Pei Shangde)
Bishop Matthias Pei Xiangde (Pei Shangde) (born 1918, died ) Bishop of Beijing [Peking]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZhangjiapu
Death PlaceZhangjiakou

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Dec 2019
  • b/c2+: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast