Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Dorado Soto

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Málaga, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1931Born
1 Apr 195624.7Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 197038.7AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
10 May 197038.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
1 Sep 197342.2AppointedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain
26 Mar 199361.7AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
10 Oct 200877.3RetiredBishop of Málaga, Spain
17 Mar 201583.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Dorado Soto
Bishop Antonio Dorado Soto (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Málaga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrda

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 433
  • d: CB, 17 Mar 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast