Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander Sokołowski

Deceased

Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592¹BornWladislavien
1626¹34.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 163644.5AppointedBishop of Kyiv (Kijów), Ukraine
27 Nov 163644.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kyiv (Kijów), Ukraine
9 May 164553.3DiedBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexander Sokołowski:
Bishop Alexander Sokołowski (born 1592, died ) Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow)

  • a priest for 19.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 149
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 97, Number 587
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 1 Jul 2015