Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Denis Delfino

Deceased

Patriarch of Aquileia


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Feb 1698AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Aquileia, Italy
8 Feb 1698AppointedTitular Bishop of Lorea
4 May 1698Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lorea
20 Jul 1699SucceededPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy
13 Aug 1734DiedPatriarch of Aquileia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Denis Delfino:
Patriarch Denis Delfino (died ) Patriarch of Aquileia

  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 94, and Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013