Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Uldericus Nardi

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1637³BornPoppi
18 Oct 166730.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 169861.2AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
25 Jul 169861.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
17 Apr 170567.9DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Uldericus Nardi:
Bishop Uldericus Nardi (born , died ) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 Jun 2015