Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fortunato Ilario Cardinal Carafa della Spina

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornNaples
2 Sep 168656.6Elevated to Cardinal
7 Jul 168757.5AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
7 Jul 168757.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
5 Oct 168757.7Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
16 Jan 169767.0DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fortunato Ilario Carafa della Spina:
Fortunato Ilario Cardinal Carafa della Spina (born 1630, died ) Bishop of Aversa

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
  • a cardinal for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1687, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 23 Apr 2015