Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Isidro Orozco Manrique de Lara

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1681BornMadrid
21 Jul 173251.1AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
5 Oct 173251.3Ordained BishopBishop of Jaén, Spain
5 May 173856.9AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
1 Feb 174563.7DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Isidro Orozco Manrique de Lara:
Archbishop Manuel Isidro Orozco Manrique de Lara (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 176, and Page 225
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 51, Number 215
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015