Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Péter Orosz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1917Born
26 Jun 194224.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 194427.4Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
27 Aug 195336.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Péter Orosz
Bishop Péter Orosz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiri

  • a priest for 11.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,003
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bp/bd/op/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast