Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Noel Seyoum Fransua

Vicar Apostolic of Hosanna, Ethiopia

Titular Bishop of Eminentiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1970 Born
5 Sep 199828.0Ordained PriestPriest of Meki, Ethiopia
8 Apr 201746.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hosanna, Ethiopia
8 Apr 201746.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Eminentiana
2 Jul 201746.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eminentiana

MicroData Summary for Noel Seyoum Fransua
Father Noel Seyoum Fransua (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Hosanna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaragu

Please contact the Father through the Vicariate Apostolic of Hosanna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2017
  • name/c2: CB, 26 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017