Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Abraham Nehmé, B.C.

Archbishop Emeritus of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1927 BornKaïtouly
3 Jan 195426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Chouerite Order of Saint John the Baptist (Melkite Greek)
20 Aug 198658.9AppointedArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria
26 Oct 198659.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria
200678.2RetiredArchbishop of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek), Syria

MicroData Summary for Abraham Nehmé:
Archbishop Abraham Nehmé B.C. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Homs (-Hama-Jabrud) (Melkite Greek).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013