Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Ncamiso Ndlovu, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Manzini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1945BornEnkaba
12 Apr 197530.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
4 May 197833.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
1 Jul 198540.2AppointedBishop of Manzini, Swaziland
12 Oct 198540.5Ordained BishopBishop of Manzini, Swaziland
27 Aug 201267.4DiedBishop of Manzini, Swaziland

MicroData Summary for Louis Ncamiso Ndlovu:
Bishop Louis Ncamiso Ndlovu O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Manzini

  • a priest for 34.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 27 Aug 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015