Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Igual de Soria

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1746BornEl Gordo
22 Sep 179549.1AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
8 Nov 179549.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
16 May 180356.8AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
14 Sep 1814³68.1DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Igual de Soria:
Bishop Lorenzo Igual de Soria (born , died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 309
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 113, Number 593

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013