Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de Moya de la Torre, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Osma, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1731Born
21 Feb 179463.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop
21 Feb 179463.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pharsalus
30 Mar 179463.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Pharsalus
28 Mar 179968.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Osma, Spain
19 Feb 180170.0ResignedBishop of Osma, Spain
1804¹72.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Osma, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Moya de la Torre
Archbishop Juan de Moya de la Torre O.F.M. Obs. (born , died 1804) Bishop Emeritus of Osma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAracena
Ordained BishopAranjuez

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 323, and Page 336
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 111, Number 581
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1794, Number 8
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,547
  • ln/ob: CB, 4 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast