Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventure Nahimana

Bishop of Rutana, Burundi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1959 Born
10 Aug 198627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Gitega, Burundi
17 Jan 200949.6AppointedBishop of Rutana, Burundi
28 Mar 200949.8Ordained BishopBishop of Rutana, Burundi

MicroData Summary for Bonaventure Nahimana
Bishop Bonaventure Nahimana (born ) Bishop of Rutana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGisebuzi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rutana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,085
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast