Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Benedicto Moscoso Miranda

Bishop of Jalapa, Guatemala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1959 Born
3 Jan 198727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Jalapa, Guatemala
30 Mar 202060.7AppointedBishop of Jalapa, Guatemala
29 Jun 202060.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jalapa, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for José Benedicto Moscoso Miranda
Bishop José Benedicto Moscoso Miranda (born ) Bishop of Jalapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Luis Jilotepeque, Diocese of Jalapa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jalapa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Mar 2020
  • ob: CB, 23 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 29 Jun 2020

Quantcast