Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ramón Montero

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos

Note/Previous Titular See: (Abbot/San Ildefonso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1777BornFuencarral
13 Mar 182648.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
14 May 182648.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
25 Jan 183052.4SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Coria, Spain
15 Mar 183052.5ConfirmedBishop of Coria, Spain
12 Sep 184770.0SelectedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
4 Oct 184770.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
30 Mar 184870.6DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Montero:
Archbishop Ramón Montero (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 163
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 143, and Page 213
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 144, Number 780

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013