Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Ceruelo de la Fuente

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1755BornParedes de Nava
10 Jul 181559.6AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
17 Sep 181559.8Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
26 Mar 183680.3DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Ceruelo de la Fuente:
Bishop Gregorio Ceruelo de la Fuente (born , died ) Bishop of Oviedo

  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 36
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 131, Number 704

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015